This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2019 at 02:12:40 (UTC).

AMIR JAHANI VS ECO-PLANT UPGRADE SOLUTIONS INC

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 AMIR JAHANI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ECO-PLANT UPGRADE SOLUTIONS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8319

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JAHANI AMIR

Defendants and Respondents

RUIZ JOSEF

ECO-PLANT UPGRADE SOLUTIONS INC.

DOES 1 TO25

MCGLEW ROBERT

ECO-PLANT UPGRADE SOLUTIONS INC. DBA ECO-PLANET UPGRADE SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STANOJEVIC MARIJANA ESQ

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NORTON JOHN M. ESQ.

NORTON JOHN MATTHEW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/29/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF MARIJANA STANOJEVIC, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/16/2018: DECLARATION OF MARIJANA STANOJEVIC, ESQ. RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STATUS CONFERENCE

7/17/2018: NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order

7/25/2018: Minute Order

Joint Status Conference Report

10/12/2018: Joint Status Conference Report

Status Report

10/15/2018: Status Report

Minute Order

10/18/2018: Minute Order

Notice

11/16/2018: Notice

Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/5/2018: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/25/2019: Notice

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/15/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/15/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/23/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice

4/30/2019: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 56; Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by Eco-Plant Upgrade Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert McGlew (Defendant); Josef Ruiz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:32 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eco-Plant Upgrade Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert McGlew (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNotice ( Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by Eco-Plant Upgrade Solutions, Inc. (Defendant); Robert McGlew (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by John Matthew Norton, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amir Jahani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amir Jahani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amir Jahani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amir Jahani (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8319    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AMIR JAHANI, etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ECO-PLANT UPGRADE SOLUTIONS, INC. dba ECO-PLANET UPGRADE SOLUTIONS, INC., etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: ****8319

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: November 27, 2019

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

Jury Trial: January 27, 2020

Marijana Stanojevic seeks to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Amir Jahani. Counsel’s motion is not procedurally compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(c) states that “[t]he motion to be relieved as counsel must be accompanied by a declaration on the Declaration in Support of Attorney’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil (form MC-052).” Counsel provided a declaration in support of her motion to be relieved as counsel, but it was not on the required MC-052 form as set forth by California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362(c). There was no MC-052 form that was filed in connection with Marijana Stanojevic’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Amir Jahani and a courtesy copy of a MC-052 form was not provided to the Court.

Due to counsel’s motion not being fully compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Marijana Stanojevic’s motion to be relieved as counsel with respect to Plaintiff Amir Jahani.

Marijana Stanojevic is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 27th day of November 2019

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court