This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:10:13 (UTC).

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7277

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

DURAN ELISE

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

HAR-BRO INC.

DOES 1 - 50

Cross Defendant

COAST CONSTRUCTION AND FOUNDATION REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BRISCOE J. JACKSON ESQ.

BRISCOE JOSEPH JACKSON IV

Defendant Attorneys

HERAVI KAVEH KEVIN

SOLOMON ESKEL HAYMES

Cross Defendant Attorney

JEFFERY MONA JANE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

2/7/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/5/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Unknown

3/9/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service

3/12/2018: Proof of Service

Unknown

3/12/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/29/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

4/19/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

Unknown

4/20/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

5/9/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

5/9/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

HARBRO, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; ETC.

5/14/2018: HARBRO, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: 1. EXPRESS INDEMNITY; ETC.

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/14/2018: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF HAR-BRO, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/14/2018: ANSWER OF HAR-BRO, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

6/29/2018: Unknown

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT, COAST CONSTRUCTION AND FOUNDATION REPAIR, INC., TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HAR-BRO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

6/29/2018: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT, COAST CONSTRUCTION AND FOUNDATION REPAIR, INC., TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HAR-BRO, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order (re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial); Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Elise Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Elise Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Order (Re Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Trial and Pre-Trial Discovery Cutoffs); Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Minute Order ((Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Tria...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Elise Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Elise Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAR-BRO INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amica Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFERY MONA