This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 10:44:33 (UTC).

AMI PANNELL VS LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 AMI PANNELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5868

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PANNELL AMI

Respondents and Defendants

LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

DOES 1 TO 20

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES SHERIFF'S DEPART-

Others

ENGELIEN KEVIN - COUNTY COUNSEL

CARLSON & MESSER LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

WIRE R. THOMAS ESQ.

WIRE R. THOMAS

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

648 KENNETH HAHN HALL OF ADMINISTRATION

ENGELIEN KEVIN JOHN

CARLSON JEFFERY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEANNE L. ZIMMER

10/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEANNE L. ZIMMER

Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

10/4/2021: Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/8/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

10/8/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

10/8/2021: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF, AMI PANNELLS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO AL

10/14/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF, AMI PANNELLS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO AL

Reply - DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON A RE

10/21/2021: Reply - DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON A RE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

10/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

11/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

11/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JUNE 11, 2020) OF 04/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FORM INTERROGATORIES SETS TWO AND THREE WITHOUT OBJECTION

12/17/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FORM INTERROGATORIES SETS TWO AND THREE WITHOUT OBJECTION

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SETS ONE AND TWO DEEMED ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

12/17/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SETS ONE AND TWO DEEMED ADMITTED; REQUEST FOR IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORI

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL SECURITY OFFICER, WILLIAM BROWN TO ATTEND HIS SUBPOENAED DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE PHOTOGRAPHS AND DOCUMENTS, MEMORANDUM OF POINT

12/24/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL SECURITY OFFICER, WILLIAM BROWN TO ATTEND HIS SUBPOENAED DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE PHOTOGRAPHS AND DOCUMENTS, MEMORANDUM OF POINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEANNE L. ZIMMER

1/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEANNE L. ZIMMER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. THOMAS WIRE

1/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF R. THOMAS WIRE

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Hearing04/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON A RESCHEDULED DATE 30 DAYS BEFORE TRIAL; Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFF, AMI PANNELLS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICTS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON A RESCHEDULED DATE); Filed by Ami Pannell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum (Proposed Order Granting Defendant Los Angeles Community College's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles Sheriff's Depart- (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ami Pannell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41 AND NOTICE OF 30-DAY AUTOMATIC EXTENSION TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING; DECLARATION OF JEANNE L. ZIMMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ami Pannell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ami Pannell (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC685868 Hearing Date: October 28, 2021 Dept: 32

\r\n\r\n

PLEASE\r\nNOTE: Parties are\r\nencouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if\r\na resolution may be reached. If the\r\nparties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this\r\ntentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s\r\nintention to submit. The email shall\r\ninclude the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact\r\ninformation (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this\r\ntentative ruling. If the Court does not\r\nreceive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling\r\nand there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off\r\ncalendar. If all parties do not submit\r\non this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which\r\nis highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative\r\nruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the\r\nsubject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE\r\nRULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n\r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n \r\n
\r\n

DEPARTMENT

\r\n
\r\n

32

\r\n
\r\n

HEARING DATE

\r\n
\r\n

October\r\n 28, 2021

\r\n
\r\n

CASE NUMBER

\r\n
\r\n

BC685868

\r\n
\r\n

MOTION

\r\n
\r\n

Motion\r\n to Continue Trial

\r\n
\r\n

MOVING PARTIES

\r\n
\r\n

Defendant\r\n Los Angeles Community College District

\r\n
\r\n

OPPOSING PARTY

\r\n
\r\n

Plaintiff\r\n Ami Pannell

\r\n
\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOTION

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant Los Angeles Community College District (“Defendant”) moves\r\nto continue the trial, which is currently set for January 21, 2022, to a date\r\nafter April 11, 2022, with the final status conference and motion and discovery\r\ncutoff dates to be based on the new trial date. \r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

“Continuances are granted only\r\non an affirmative showing of good cause requiring a continuance.” (In\r\nre Marriage of Falcone & Fyke (2008) 164 Cal.App.4th 814, 823.) A\r\ntrial court has broad discretion in considering a request for a trial\r\ncontinuance. (Pham v. Nguyen (1997) 54 Cal.App.4th 11,\r\n13-18.) California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332 sets forth factors for the\r\nCourt to consider in ruling on a motion to continue trial. Whether the parties have stipulated to the\r\npostponement is a relevant factor for consideration. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 595.2, but see Lorraine v. McComb (1934) 220 Cal. 753,\r\n756-757 [finding a stipulation to be merely “directory”].)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Here, Defendant seeks a trial continuance to allow Defendant’s motion\r\nfor summary judgment to be heard on the scheduled hearing date of March 11,\r\n2022. Defendant advances the declaration\r\nof counsel for Defendant, Jeanne L. Zimmer (“Counsel”). Counsel avers that March 11, 2022 was the\r\nfirst available hearing date for Defendant’s motion for summary judgment when\r\nCounsel sought to reserve a hearing date in July 2021. (Declaration of Jeanne L. Zimmer, ¶ 5.) Counsel further avers that she was unable to\r\nreserve a hearing date prior to July 2021 due to personal circumstances and\r\nhealth issues. (Declaration of\r\nDeclaration of Jeanne L. Zimmer, ¶ 5.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

In opposition, Plaintiff asserts that Defendant has not proffered good\r\ncause for a continuance. In the\r\nalternative, counsel for Plaintiff represents that he is unavailable for trial\r\nbefore April 15, 2022, and available for the presently scheduled hearing date\r\nof March 11, 2022 for Defendant’s motion for summary judgment.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Based on Counsel’s representations and Plaintiff’s availability for Defendant’s\r\nproposed dates, the Court concludes that Defendants haven shown good cause for\r\na trial continuance pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

CONCLUSION\r\nAND ORDER

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Therefore, the Court grants Defendant’s motion to continue trial and\r\norders as follows:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARLSON & MESSER LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIRE R. THOMAS ESQ.