This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:19:35 (UTC).

AMEY ENTERPRISE INC VS MARC JACOBS INTERNATIONAL LLC

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 AMEY ENTERPRISE INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARC JACOBS INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8372

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMEY ENTERPRISES INC.

Defendant

MARC JACOBS INTERNATIONAL L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRUCKER MICHAEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN COMMERCIAL LEASE [NON-U.D.] 2. BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING

12/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN COMMERCIAL LEASE [NON-U.D.] 2. BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING

SUMMONS

12/28/2017: SUMMONS

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

1/11/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

1/8/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Minute Order

1/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/19/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/23/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference (Initial Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Amey Enterprises Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amey Enterprises Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN COMMERCIAL LEASE [NON-U.D.] 2. BREACH OF IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less