This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 04:12:36 (UTC).

AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS JONATHAN SIEGEL

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JONATHAN SIEGEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1130

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Respondent

SIEGEL JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILL TIMOTHY N.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

4/14/2021: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

8/27/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITON TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

10/6/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITON TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

3/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY N. WILL RE FINRA WAIVER LETTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD AND IN RESPONSE TO COURTS TENTATIVE RULING

3/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY N. WILL RE FINRA WAIVER LETTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD AND IN RESPONSE TO COURTS TENTATIVE RULING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TIMOTHY N. WILL RE FINRA WAIVER LETTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD AND IN RESPONSE TO COURTS TENTATIVE RULING); Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TIMOTHY N. WILL RE FINRA WAIVER LETTER IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD AND IN RESPONSE TO COURTS TENTATIVE RULING); Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, Inc. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILL TIMOTHY N.