This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2022 at 09:19:20 (UTC).

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC VS MONTAGE MORTGAGE LLC

Case Summary

On 03/28/2018 AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against MONTAGE MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3009

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

Defendant

MONTAGE MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PFEIFER MICHAEL R.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

9/5/2018: JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

9/5/2018: ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

9/5/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Proof of Service -

8/31/2018: Proof of Service -

AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

9/4/2018: AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

8/13/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

8/13/2018: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL R. PFEIFER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order -

7/23/2018: Minute Order -

SUMMONS -

7/23/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

6/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Proof of Service -

4/25/2018: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by Certified Shorthand Reporter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT ON PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO CONFIRM, CORRECT, OR VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less