This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 11:23:15 (UTC).

AMERIGRADE VS TBB VALLEY INVESTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 AMERIGRADE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TBB VALLEY INVESTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8619

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERIGRADE

Defendants

AMBER INVESTMENT GROUP INC.

BEGHI EDOARDO

BRANDOLINO JEFF

COUNTRYWIDE BANK N.A.

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

RECON INVESTMENT FUND B LLC

TBB VALLEY INVESTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWMAN STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/3/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/10/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amerigrade (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TBB Valley Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RECON INVESTMENT FUND B LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant