This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2022 at 01:32:19 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL VS N & R LATIN SHIPPING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC DBA GM FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against N R LATIN SHIPPING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0653

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL

Defendant

N & R LATIN SHIPPING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERNEST STEVEN E.

Defendant Attorney

PRESLEY CLAY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. ERNEST

8/11/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. ERNEST

Complaint

8/11/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

8/24/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

8/24/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/24/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KAYANNE MOORE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

8/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KAYANNE MOORE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF P...)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF P...)

Answer

10/22/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

12/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by N & R Latin Shipping, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by N & R Latin Shipping, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF KAYANNE MOORE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION); Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Steven E. Ernest); Filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESLEY CLAY EDWARD