This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 18:37:41 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL VS CARLOS CRUZ

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC DBA GM FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARLOS CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4099

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. DBA GM FINANCIAL DBA GM FINANCIAL

Defendant

CRUZ CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERNEST STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. ERNEST RE: VENUE PUSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 2984.4

9/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN E. ERNEST RE: VENUE PUSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 2984.4

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/4/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

10/4/2021: Notice of Application and Hearing for Claim and Delivery (CCP 512.030) - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND HEARING (CLAIM AND DELIVERY)

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

10/4/2021: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

11/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

11/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 82 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession (CCP 512.010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Hearing12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Support of Writ of Possession); Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing (Claim and Delivery); Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF STEVEN E. ERNEST RE: VENUE PUSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 2984.4); Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AmeriCredit Financial Services, Inc. dba GM Financial (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERNEST STEVEN E