Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 01:04:27 (UTC).

AMERICAN TRUST ESCROW INC VS EUGENIA M DEL VALLE ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 AMERICAN TRUST ESCROW INC filed an Other lawsuit against EUGENIA M DEL VALLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1175

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN TRUST ESCROW INC.

Defendants and Respondents

SIDHU SAM

DEL VALLE EUGENIA M.

CHUNG YONG HWA

DOES 1 THROGUH 10

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DAVIS MATTHEW S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2019: Request for Dismissal

Application

12/24/2018: Application

Notice of Ruling

12/19/2018: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for

12/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

12/24/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

9/11/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER

9/11/2018: COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER

Notice

10/9/2018: Notice

Notice

11/21/2018: Notice

Minute Order

12/18/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

12/18/2018: Ex Parte Application

Certificate of Mailing for

11/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2018: Proof of Personal Service

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

9/26/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (And Order To Show Cause ReWhy The Interplead Funds Should Not Be Distributed) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • at 10:31 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/24/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Application (for Order of Disbursement of Funds the Subject of the Complaint-In-Interpleader and Dismissal of Action pursuant to Settlement); Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice (of Deposit of Funds The Subject of Complaint in Interpleader in Accordance with C.C.P. Section 386(c)); Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by American Trust Escrow, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • NOI1CE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT-IN-INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS MATTHEW STEPHEN