This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2020 at 14:55:20 (UTC).

AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY ET AL VS EDUWIGES TORRES

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDUWIGES TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1880

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY

SEDGWICK CMS INCORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

TORRES EDUWIGES

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TURCHIN AARON S. ESQ.

TURCHIN AARON SHOLEM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF THIMOTHY J. O'SHEA

LAW OFFICE OF MARVIN P. VELASTEGUI

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/16/2019

9/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/16/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

9/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

4/29/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/29/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

5/4/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/4/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

11/3/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

11/3/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY (Plaintiff); SEDGWICK CMS INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docketat 3:08 PM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY (Plaintiff); SEDGWICK CMS INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 09/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by EDUWIGES TORRES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by EDUWIGES TORRES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by EDUWIGES TORRES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by EDUWIGES TORRES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY (Plaintiff); SEDGWICK CMS INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY (Plaintiff); SEDGWICK CMS INCORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR NEGLIGENT OPERATION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN STATES WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURCHIN AARON