This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2020 at 14:35:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE OF STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC E VS OSWALDO DIAZ

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE OF STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC E filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OSWALDO DIAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0171

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE OF STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE FUND AND INDEPENDENT AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendant

DIAZ OSWALDO DBA STORM PLASTERING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APOSHIAN GEORGE VATCHE

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/6/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/11/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated, a California Corporation as Assignee of State Compensation Insurance Fund, a Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated, a California Corporation as Assignee of State Compensation Insurance Fund, a Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Recovery Service Incorporated, a California Corporation as Assignee of State Compensation Insurance Fund, a Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.