This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 10:33:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN INVESTMENT GROUP LLC ET AL VS ALIREZA MAHDAVI ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 AMERICAN INVESTMENT GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALIREZA MAHDAVI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2347

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Respondents

AVALON COLD STORAGE LLC

AMERICAN INVESTMENT GROUP LLC

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL COLD

AVALON COLD STORAGE LLC FKA AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL COLD STORAGE LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Petitioners

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL LLC

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL

MAHDAVI ALIREZA

DOES 1 TO 50

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION LLC

AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JACOBS MARTIN E. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/18/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

4/10/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ALIREZA MAHDA VI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ALIREZA MAHDA VI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ALIREZA MAHDAVI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ALIREZA MAHDAVI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES?GENERAL, SET ONE

1/16/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES?GENERAL, SET ONE

DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. JACOBS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL (SET ONE) AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ATTORNEY

1/9/2018: DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. JACOBS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL (SET ONE) AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ATTORNEY

DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. JACOBS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF AT

1/9/2018: DECLARATION OF MARTIN E. JACOBS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET ONE) AND FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF AT

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. SCHAUB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE

12/21/2017: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. SCHAUB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL, LLC TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL, SET ONE

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN INVESTMENT GR

12/21/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION, LLC'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN INVESTMENT GR

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. SCHAUB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

12/21/2017: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. SCHAUB IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN LOGISTICS INTERNATIONAL WAREHOUSING & DISTRIBUTION, LLC TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MAHDAVI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC'S FORM INTERROGATORIES?GENERAL, SET ONE

12/21/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY ISSUES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT MAHDAVI'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF AMERICAN INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC'S FORM INTERROGATORIES?GENERAL, SET ONE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL; ETC

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL; ETC

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

5/22/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FROM APRIL 12, 2019 TO May 13, 2019); Filed by American Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff); American Logistics International (Plaintiff); Avalon Cold Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 24; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER KANDEL) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER KANDEL); Filed by American Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff); American Logistics International (Plaintiff); Avalon Cold Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 24; Non-Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FROM APRIL 12, 2019 TO May 13, 2019); Filed by American Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff); American Logistics International (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF FARHAD NOVIAN) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATIO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
159 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by American Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff); American Logistics International (Plaintiff); Avalon Cold Storage, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by American Investment Group, LLC (Plaintiff); American Logistics International (Plaintiff); Avalon Cold Storage, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC662347    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 24

Plaintiffs’ default judgment application is GRANTED, conditioned on correcting the following issues.

The Court notes the following issues.