This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 16:46:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN INTEGRATED RESOURCES, INC. VS CANYON BUILDING AND DESIGN, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 AMERICAN INTEGRATED RESOURCES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CANYON BUILDING AND DESIGN, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8747

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN INTEGRATED RESOURCES INC.

Defendants

CANYON BUILDING AND DESIGN LLC

MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY MUTUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACCARLEY MARK

Defendant Attorneys

RALLS JOHN W.

EDWARDS FLORA

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE

4/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/23/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Answer

11/23/2021: Answer

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY, FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE; MEMORANDUM, VERIFIED APPLICATION, AND DECLARATION OF JOHN W.

11/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY, FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE; MEMORANDUM, VERIFIED APPLICATION, AND DECLARATION OF JOHN W.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 12/02/2021

12/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 12/02/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY, FL...)

12/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY, FL...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER

12/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/10/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application - APPLICATION NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION AND APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY, FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE

12/16/2021: Application - APPLICATION NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION AND APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY, FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/16/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

1/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Notice of Ruling

1/18/2022: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

2/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/28/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

2/28/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Case Management Statement

3/7/2022: Case Management Statement

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 4:30 PM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE); Filed by Canyon Building and Design, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 09:59 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Hearing on Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ...) of 03/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketOrder (GRANTING APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY, FLORA EDWARDS, TO APPEAR AND PARTICIPATE PRO HAC VICE IN THIS CASE); Filed by John W. Ralls (Attorney); Flora Edwards (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Hearing on Motion to Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Canyon Building and Design, LLC (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by American Integrated Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by American Integrated Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Courtroom Online Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Integrated Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Integrated Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Integrated Resources, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RALLS JOHN W.