This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2018 at 05:53:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY VS DORA MUZZO

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DORA MUZZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4413

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

MUZZO DORA

DOES 1 TO 15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FERBER BRIAN J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION: 1. NEGLIGENCE

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION: 1. NEGLIGENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

12/6/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

3/16/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less