This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 23:36:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN HEALTH HOLDING, INC., AN OHIO CORPORATION VS ADVANCED MEDICAL REVIEWS, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 AMERICAN HEALTH HOLDING, INC , AN OHIO CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADVANCED MEDICAL REVIEWS, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3978

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

AMERICAN HEALTH HOLDING INC. AN OHIO CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

ADVANCED MEDICAL REVIEWS LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHBACH RYAN D.

Cross Defendant Attorney

PLATT DANIEL A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/1/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

3/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/22/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

4/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

Cross-Complaint

4/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

General Denial

4/14/2022: General Denial

Answer

5/17/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/21/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

7/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company on 04/14/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company as to American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/10/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/10/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation on 02/01/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation as to Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation (Cross-Defendant); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Errata re: Defendant's Cross-Complaint for Breach of Contract; Filed by: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAddress for Daniel A. Platt (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Daniel A. Platt (Attorney): Organization Name changed from LOEB & LOEB LLP to Loeb & Loeb LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Health Holding, Inc., an Ohio Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Medical Reviews, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less