This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2022 at 15:48:15 (UTC).

AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS RYAN EZHARI

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RYAN EZHARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0694

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

EZHARI RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEEDY CHRISTOPHER MADDEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint in Interpleader

10/28/2022: Complaint in Interpleader

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PROOF OF SERVICE BY EMAIL AND REGULAR MAIL

11/2/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PROOF OF SERVICE BY EMAIL AND REGULAR MAIL

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT'S ANS TO ROGS, SET ONE

11/4/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT'S ANS TO ROGS, SET ONE

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL CLMT'S ANSWERS TO ROGS-OFF CALENDAR

11/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL CLMT'S ANSWERS TO ROGS-OFF CALENDAR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/22/2022

11/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/22/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Compel Verified Answers Without Objections to Interrogatories (No. 1); Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $661.65, Filed by Plaintiff American Family Connect Property Casualty Insurance Company 2639-1676SPC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Verified Answers Without Objections to Interrogatories (No. 1); Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $661.65, Filed by Plaintiff American Family Connect Property Casualty Insurance Company 2639-1676SPC scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/22/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Verified Answers Without Objections to Interrogatories (No. 1); Request for Sanctions in the Amount of $661.65, Filed by Plaintiff American Family Connect Property Casualty Insurance Company 2639-1676SPC scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/17/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of taking motion to compel clmt's answers to rogs-off calendar; Filed by: AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Compel Verified Answer Without Objections to Interrogatories (No. 1); Request For Sanctions In The Amount of $661.65; Declaration of Stephen P. Calendo; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof: Exact Name: Notice of Motion to Compel Verified Answer Without Objections to Interrogatories (No. 1); Request For Sanctions In The Amount of $661.65; Declaration of Stephen P. Calendo; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Claimant Ryan Ezhari's answers to interrogatories, set one scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel CLAIMANT'S ANS TO ROGS, SET ONE; Filed by: AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lodging proof of service by email and regular mail; Filed by: AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RYAN EZHARI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: RYAN EZHARI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AN WISCONSIN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEEDY CRISTOPHER M. ESQ.