Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 19:31:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS VICKIE DEAN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICKIE DEAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

DEAN VICKIE AKA VICKIE K DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDARO AARON

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/3/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/3/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

1/27/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21TRCV00028    Hearing Date: March 16, 2021    Dept: M

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Southwest District

Torrance Dept. M

JOANNA MORAN,

Petitioner,

Case No.:

21TRCP00028

vs.

[Tentative] RULING

CETERA ADVISOR NETWORKS LLC,

Respondent.

Hearing Date: March 16, 2021

Moving Parties: Petitioner Joanna Moran

Responding Party: Cetera Advisor Networks LLC

Petition to Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award

The court considered the petition and respondent’s notice of non-opposition.

RULING

The petition is GRANTED. The award is confirmed, and judgment is entered in conformity therewith.

LEGAL AUTHORITY

Under CCP §1285, any party to an arbitration in which an award has been made may petition the court to confirm, correct or vacate the award. The petition shall name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award.

Under CCP §1285.4, a petition under this chapter shall: (a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement. (b) Set forth names of the arbitrators. (c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.

Under CCP §1286, if a petition or response under this chapter is duly served and filed, the court shall confirm the award as made, whether rendered in this state or another state, unless in accordance with this chapter it corrects the award and confirms it as corrected, vacates the award or dismisses the proceedings.

DISCUSSION

Petitioner Joanna Moran requests that the court confirm the arbitrator’s award against Cetera Advisor Networks LLC.

Petitioner has met the procedural requirements of CCP §1285.4. Petitioner attached the arbitration agreement (FINRA Arbitration Submission Agreements) and Award of Arbitrator. The arbitration was conducted on June 16, 2020. The arbitrator recommended expungement of all references to a customer arbitration from petitioner’s Central Registration Depository record.

In a response, respondent states that it does not oppose petitioner’s efforts to seek expungement of the complaint from her CRD records and otherwise waives notice and service. Because petitioner has met her burden under CCP §1285.4 and respondent does not oppose and has not provided any ground for vacating the award under CCP §1286.2 or correcting the award under CCP §1286.6, the motion is GRANTED. “If an award is confirmed, judgment shall be entered in conformity therewith. . . .”

Moving party is ordered to give notice of the ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALDARO, AARON N.