This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:08:26 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS OFER KAHANA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against OFER KAHANA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5685

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

KAHANA OFER

KAHAN OFER

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

KAHANA OFER AKA OFER KAHAN

Defendant, Respondent and Not Yet Classified

KAHAN OFER

 

Court Documents

Declaration

1/3/2019: Declaration

Unknown

11/1/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/1/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

8/27/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

DECLARATION

9/6/2018: DECLARATION

Unknown

9/6/2018: Unknown

DECLARATION OF BRIAN P. MCGURK RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

8/21/2018: DECLARATION OF BRIAN P. MCGURK RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE S. HO RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

8/6/2018: DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE S. HO RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE S. HO RE: LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/6/2018: DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE S. HO RE: LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

7/9/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF LINA M. MICHAEL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

6/15/2018: DECLARATION OF LINA M. MICHAEL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S)

NON SERVICE REPORT

5/30/2018: NON SERVICE REPORT

NON SERVICE REPORT

6/5/2018: NON SERVICE REPORT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/21/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

SUMMONS

5/9/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1, COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED ;ETC

5/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1, COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED ;ETC

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Declaration (of Christina L. Rymsza RE: Order to Show Cause); Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (Service) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • at 1:53 PM in Department 40; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuation of the 5/17/19 he...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Declaration ( of Christina L. Rymsza RE: Order to Show Cause); Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Order for Publication; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: (Service) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Notice of Non-Service - Other; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1, COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705685    Hearing Date: January 09, 2020    Dept: 40

Case Name: American Express National Bank v. Ofer Kahana,

Case #: BC705685 Hearing Date: 1/9/20 (OSC:re entry of default judgment)

Moving Party: Plaintiff American Express National Bank (“Plaintiff”)

Defaulting Party: Defendant Ofer Kahana (“Defendant”)

Total Amount: $25,960.77

BACKGROUND: In 2007, Defendant opened a credit card account with Plaintiff. As of October 2019, Defendant has an outstanding balance in that account of $25,110.77.

[X] DEFAULT ENTERED ON: 8/22/19 against Defendant

[X] MANDATORY JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM CIV-100 SUBMITTED FOR ENTRY OF

COURT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.1800(a))

[X] SERVICE:

Complaint and Summons: In May/June 2019, Defendant was served via publication in the Los Angeles Daily Journal.

[X] DECLARATION OF MAILING -- Request for Entry of Default to Defendant (CCP § 587)

[X] NO PENDING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

[X] SUMMARY OF CASE PROVIDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(1)) - or other declaration OK [ ]

[X] EVIDENTIARY DECLARATIONS/OTHER EVIDENCE (CRC 3.1800(a)(2))

[X] RELIEF PRAYED FOR IN COMPLAINT (same as requested in default?): [X] yes[ ] no

[X] Compensatory: $ 25,110.77

Special: $

General: $

[ ] Interest: $

[X] Costs: $ 850.00

[ ] Attorney’ Fees: $

Total: $ 25,960.77

[N/A] INTEREST COMPUTATIONS (CRC 3.1800(a)(3))

[N/A] ATTORNEY FEE DECLARATION -- Request according to Local Rule 3.214 or reason provided why greater fees should be allowed (CRC 3.1800(b))

[ ] Request for atty fees allowed by statute or agreement of parties

[ ] $960/$1,200 for book account claim (Civil Code § 1717.5)

[X] MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (CRC 3.1800(a)(4))

[N/A] STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (CCP § 425.11):

[ ] PI/Death Case [ ] Punitive demanded [ ] Accounting

[ ] Evidence of net worth of defendant? [ ] Yes [ ] No

[X] DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS executed within 6 months?

Date: 8-21-19 (CRC 3.1800(a)(5); Interinsurance Exchange v. Collins (1994) 30 Cal.App.4th 1445, 1447.)

[X] REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES (CRC 3.1800(a)(7))

[ ] If not, authority/basis for several judgment (CCP § 579)

[N/A] WAS DEFAULTING DEFENDANT A DOE? (CCP § 474) - must do one of the following:

[ ] Summons notifies defendant that s/he was served under a fictitious name

[ ] Proof of service states that the Doe amendment form was served with the complaint

[ ] Complaint amended to reflect the true defendant’s name & allegations support claim

[X] ORIGINALS Promissory note or other written obligation to pay money must be provided for cancellation by the Clerk per CRC 3.1806

[ ] If no originals, declaration explaining loss/destruction/unavailability of originals

[X] Proposed order for Court to accept authenticated copy in lieu of original

[X] PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT INCLUDED (CRC 3.1800(a)(6))

TENTATIVE RULING: The matter is submitted on declaration pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 585(d). The

Court has read and considered the documents submitted in support of entry of default judgment.

Judgment is signed and filed this date.

Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff American Express National Bank against Defendant Ofer Kahana on the Complaint filed by American Express National Bank on 5/9/2018 for damages of $25,110.77 and costs of $850.00, for a total of $ 25,960.77.