Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 02:15:20 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS JEFFREY ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEFFREY ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ORTIZ JEFFREY AKA JEFFREY R ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDARO AARON

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION (PERMITTING USE OF COPIES)

4/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION (PERMITTING USE OF COPIES)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/9/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT

4/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT

Summary of the Case

4/9/2021: Summary of the Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 12:00 PM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration (Permitting Use of Copies)); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of attorney in response to the court's order to show cause); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALDARO, AARON N.