This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2022 at 03:53:07 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB VS VICKI L WALLS

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICKI L WALLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0808

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

WALLS VICKI L AKA VICKI WALLS AKA VICKIE LEE WALLS AKA VICTORIA L WALLS AN INDIVIDUAL

Glendale, CA 91202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLINSKY LOURDES R.

Defendant Attorney

MAY WILLIAM DEREK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Substitution of Attorney

9/22/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KAMBRIE L. KEITH RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

9/27/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KAMBRIE L. KEITH RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

5/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & TRIAL

5/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE & TRIAL

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/24/2022: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

7/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT J...)

General Denial

11/4/2021: General Denial

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HENRY J. YANDELL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/10/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HENRY J. YANDELL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Case Management Statement

11/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION

10/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER

10/27/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB on 06/10/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: VICKI L WALLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/04/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF KAMBRIE L. KEITH RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: VICKI L WALLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: VICKI L WALLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: VICKI L WALLS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAY WILLIAM DEREK