This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 02:53:08 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB, ET AL. VS MATTHEW A STORMOEN

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW A STORMOEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0059

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

STORMOEN MATTHEW A AKA MATTHEW STORMOEN AKA MATT ALLEN STORMOEN AKA MATTHEW ALLEN STORMOEN AKA MATTHEW ASTORMOEN AN INDIVIDUAL

Malibu, CA 90265-5079

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service - No Service

1/20/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

1/27/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

5/5/2022: Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M