This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 21:21:06 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS JOSEPH KIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2893

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants

KIM JOSEPH AKA JOSEPH S KIM AKA SON BYN KIM AKA JOSE KIM AKA JOSEPHSUNBYN KIM AN INDIVIDUAL

CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONST DBA CAL AVERLAND CONST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYMSZA CHRISTINA LYNN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING) OF 09/15/2020

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING) OF 09/15/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT

8/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

8/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE; DEFAULT PROVE UP

8/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE; DEFAULT PROVE UP

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE MANAGEMENT CO...)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE MANAGEMENT CO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

Declaration - DECLARATION LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Case Management Statement

6/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

3/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

2/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Case Management Statement

1/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ORDER AND SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO BE SUB-SERVED ON THE CA SOS

12/2/2019: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ORDER AND SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO BE SUB-SERVED ON THE CA SOS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY YANDELL, ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

11/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HENRY YANDELL, ESQ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

10/1/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

7/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 09/15/2020 entered for Plaintiff American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB against Defendant Joseph Kim AKA Jose Kim, AKA Joseph S Kim, AKA Josephsunbyn Kim, an ind...); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Default Prove Up Hearing) of 09/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Henry Yandell, ESQ. RE: Late Filing Of Case Management Statement); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Non Service); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Non-Service); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Express National Bank, Successor by Merger to American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYMSZA CHRISTINA