This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 10:31:08 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, ET AL. VS GIANT C TA

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIANT C TA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8806

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

TA GIANG C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution

1/14/2019: Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution

1/14/2019: Writ of Execution

Request for Dismissal

12/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

12/28/2018: Minute Order

Order

12/28/2018: Order

Unknown

12/28/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

1/2/2019: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/5/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

8/17/2018: Declaration

Request

8/17/2018: Request

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Re Submission of Default Judgment package) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Re Submission of Default Judgment pac...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Order (FOR JUDGMENT AND COURT'S ACCEPTANCE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS); Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Judgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/28/2018 entered for Plaintiff American Express National Bank fka American Express Centurion Bank against Defendant Giang C Ta, an individual.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Declaration (Kambrie L. Keith); Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Request FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Legacy Party); American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Legacy Party); American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Legacy Party); American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Summons; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Legacy Party); American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by American Express Centurion Bank (Legacy Party); American Express National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant