Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 03:29:14 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK... VS SHANE CATES; ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANE CATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2366

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ...

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

CATES CHRISTOPHER S.

CATES CHRISTOPHOR S.

CATES CHRISTOPHE SHANE

CATES SHANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LINA M. MICHAEL ESQ

MICHAEL LINA M

Defendant Attorney

FITZGERALD & CAMPBELL APLC

 

Court Documents

Summons

10/6/2017: Summons

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/19/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/27/2017: Answer

Case Management Statement

2/15/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/23/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

3/12/2018: Minute Order

Other -

3/12/2018: Other -

Exhibit List

9/17/2018: Exhibit List

Witness List

9/17/2018: Witness List

Witness List

9/21/2018: Witness List

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

9/21/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

Exhibit List

9/26/2018: Exhibit List

Notice of Settlement

10/22/2018: Notice of Settlement

Unknown

10/24/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

10/24/2018: Minute Order

Notice

11/8/2018: Notice

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause - Settlement - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Stipulation and Order (for entry of stipulation for conditional entry of Judgment & Dismissal pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice (to Order to Show Cause Hearing Re: Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (Of Entire Case); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:34 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by SHANE CATES (Defendant); CHRISTOPHER S. CATES (Legacy Party); CHRISTOPHE SHANE CATES (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; (OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by SHANE CATES (Defendant); CHRISTOPHER S. CATES (Legacy Party); CHRISTOPHE SHANE CATES (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Summons; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK,... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: YC072366    Hearing Date: November 30, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka

Department B

Monday, November 30, 2020

Calendar No. 9

PROCEEDINGS

American Express Centurion Bank v. Shane Cates, et al.

YC072366

1. American Express Centurion Bank’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and to Enter Judgment Pursuant to the Terms of Settlement

TENTATIVE RULING

American Express Centurion Bank’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and to Enter Judgment Pursuant to the Terms of Settlement is granted.

CCP § 664.6 states: “If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.”

On October 23, 2018, the parties entered into a “Stipulation for Conditional Entry of Judgment.” (Declaration, Spencer Penuela, ¶ 4; Ex. A.) The stipulation states that the court shall retain jurisdiction and that the settlement may be enforced pursuant to CCP § 664.6. Plaintiff submitted evidence that Defendant did not comply with the settlement agreement by failing to make the required monthly payments. (Decl. Spencer Penuela, ¶¶ 7-9.)

Thus, Plaintiff’s Motion for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to the Terms of the Settlement is granted. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Shane Cates in the sum of $27,706.86.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Case Number: YC072366    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: B

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Gary Y. Tanaka

Department B

Thursday, October 8, 2020

Calendar No. 10

PROCEEDINGS

American Express Centurion Bank v. Shane Cates, et al.

YC072366

  1. American Express Centurion Bank’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and to Enter Judgment Pursuant to the Terms of Settlement

    TENTATIVE RULING

    American Express Centurion Bank’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal and to Enter Judgment Pursuant to the Terms of Settlement is continued.

    Plaintiff has failed to establish that it gave notice of the current hearing date to the Defendant.

    Thus, the motion is continued to ________________________.

    Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M