This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 18:13:29 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS RYAN YU ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RYAN YU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSS KLEIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1089

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSS KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK - UTAH ST

Defendants

DOES 1- 20 INC.

RYAN YU- INDIV.

KEVIN H JANG LAW CORP

INDIV. RYAN YU-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL & ASSOC (CHRISTINA RYMSZA)

MICHAEL & ASSOC CHRISTINA RYMSZA

Defendant Attorney

KEVIN H JANG LAW CORP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketStipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketStipulation (STIP FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP SECTION 664.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder (ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIP FOR COND. ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMI. PER CCP 664.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketOSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt); Filed by CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK - UTAH ST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (PLNTF - AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION - CONDITIONAL 2-6-23 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RYAN YU- INDIV. (Defendant); KEVIN H JANG LAW CORP (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees (deft- RYAN YU - FEE WAIVER APP SEALED ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOrder-Court Fee Waiver (DEFT- RYAN YU - FEE WAIVER ORDER GRANTED. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by RYAN YU- INDIV. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK - UTAH ST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (P/S SUMMONS, COMP, ETC . P.S. RYAN YU - INDIV. SERVED SAME 3-14-17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed (ORIGINAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK - UTAH ST (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1089    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: S27

INTRODUCTION

Plaintiff American Express Centurion Bank (“American Express”) moves to vacate its dismissal and for entry of judgment pursuant to CCP ;664.6.

DISCUSSION

This was an action for recovery of an unpaid credit card balance alleged to be $40,614.36.

On January 24, 2018 the parties filed a “stipulation for conditional entry of judgment.” (Exhibit A) There was an agreed schedule of monthly payments of $685.58 commencing on January 22, 2018 and ending on December 22, 2022.

Upon default defendant had seven days to cure after notice.

The settlement expressly invoked CCP ;664.6 in the event of an uncured default.

Defendant executed the stipulation, which was approved as to form and content by his attorney.

Judge Ross Klein signed an order submitted by the parties which reserved the court’s jurisdiction to enforce the settlement. (Exhibit B)

Exhibit C reflects a notice of default was sent by e-mail on January 15, 2019. The arrearage was $7,549.96 excluding the $685.58 due on January 22, 2019.

Plaintiff contends judgment should be entered for $39,937.36, but there is no declaration accounting for the amount of credits.

If there is no opposition filed the court will enter judgment as requested. But if an opposition raises the issue of credits Plaintiff will be required to submit evidence of its accounting.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant