This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 17:53:46 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS VICTOR BELONOGOFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTOR BELONOGOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9417

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants

DEEP DIVE MEDIA LLC

BELONOGOFF VICTOR AKA VICTOR DELONOGOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PAHL STEPHEN DONALD ESQ.

DUGDALE ROBERT EDWARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED 2. QUANTUM MERUIT-REASONABLE VALUE

1/8/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED 2. QUANTUM MERUIT-REASONABLE VALUE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/31/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

1/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Request for Dismissal

12/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

9/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

Notice of Settlement

9/25/2019: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE) OF 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE) OF 09/25/2019

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

9/23/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

9/18/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN RE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

9/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN RE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - HEARING RE: DISMISSAL DATE)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

8/2/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

2/1/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

ANSWER FOR DEFENDANT VICTOR BELONOGOFF AKA VICTOR DELONOGOFF TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB,A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

3/6/2018: ANSWER FOR DEFENDANT VICTOR BELONOGOFF AKA VICTOR DELONOGOFF TO COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB,A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Minute Order -

7/6/2018: Minute Order -

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff); Victor Belonogoff (Defendant); Deep Dive Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Dismissal Pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by Lina M Michael, Esq. (Attorney); American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date) of 09/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by Deep Dive Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Intent to Appear by Telephone); Filed by Lina M Michael, Esq. (Attorney); American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Plaintiff's Declaration in re to OSC Re Dismissal); Filed by Lina M Michael, Esq. (Attorney); American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FOR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED 2. QUANTUM MERUIT-REASONABLE VALUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Lina M. Michael, Esq.; SBN: (237842) Brian P. McGurk, Esq.; SBN: (250091)

Christina L. Rymsza, Esq.; SBN: (233631) i j; . MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES, PC | F IR e bt 555 St. Charles Drive, Suite 204 SUM ety " Thousand Oaks, California 91360 8 2040 Telephone: (805) 379-8505 N OB EE Facsimile: (805) 379-8525 _ W{fi“ -

| hervt Bt rtes Y, (15085 Attorneys for Plaintiff, 7 o

American Express Bank, FSB By — Gloriests R lid o Our File Number: 17193868 :

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE i

BC6 89417

American Express Bank, FSB, a federal ) Case No.: savings bank, )

) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Plaintiff, 1. Common Counts: Book Account, Account Stated ‘ 2. Quantum Meruit-Reasonable Value

N’ e e’ e’

Victor Belonogoff, aka Victor Delonogoff, an ) individual; Deep Dive Media, LLC, a ) California Limited Liability Company; Does 1 ) PRAYER AMOUNT: $391,289.04

through 20, inclusive. ) ) Defendants. ) ) Plaintiff alleges as follows:

GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

1. At all times herein mentioned, Plaintiff, American Express Bank, FSB, a federal sav'ings bank, (hereinafter referred to as "AMEX"), is incorporated under United States law as a federal savings bank and as a valid corporation, is duly licensed and authorized to engage in business and is engaged in the doing of business by virtue of the laws and regulations of the State of Californa.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M