This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:58:39 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS LESLIE J. SHERMAN

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESLIE J SHERMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8105

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK FSB

Defendants

SHERMAN JR. LESLIE JAMES

AMAMGBO ASSOCIATES

SHERMAN LESLIE J

AMAMGBO & ASSOCIATES PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL LINA M.

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Summons

9/19/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/19/2017: Complaint

Unknown

10/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

Answer

10/24/2017: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/28/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

12/29/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/17/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Trial

6/11/2018: Notice of Trial

Exhibit List

8/10/2018: Exhibit List

Witness List

8/10/2018: Witness List

Trial Brief

8/10/2018: Trial Brief

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/10/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order

8/13/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

8/24/2018: Unknown

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order ({PROPOSED] ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial) of 01/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department O; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Trial Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketNotice (of case reassignment to Dept O); Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LESLIE J SHERMAN (Defendant); JR., LESLIE JAMES SHERMAN (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESSBANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8105    Hearing Date: January 19, 2021    Dept: O

Case Name: American Express Bank, FSB v. Sherman, et al.

Case No.: ****8105

Complaint Filed: 9-9-17

Hearing Date: 1-19-21

Discovery C/O: N/A

Calendar No.: 13

Discover Motion C/O: N/A

POS: OK

Trial Date: N/A

SUBJECT: MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AND ENTERING JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT PURSUANT TO CCP ;664.6

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB

RESP. PARTY: None as of 1-14-21

TENTATIVE RULING

Plaintiff American Express Bank, FSB’s Motion for Order Vacating Dismissal and Entering Judgment against Defendant pursuant to CCP ;664.6 is GRANTED. Judgment is entered against Defendant Leslie J. Sherman in the amount of $237,274.64.

Defendant Sherman defaulted on the stipulation executed on 12-12-18. Defendant made only one payment of $2500. Per ¶2 of the Stipulation, upon default, Defendant became liable for the full outstanding balance of $239,436.29 less the $2500 payment. Defendant was informed of his default and given an opportunity to cure as required under ¶2 of the Stipulation. Defendant failed to cure the default.

Plaintiff’s request to set aside the dismissal and enter judgment in accordance with the Stipulation and CCP ;664.6 is GRANTED.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M