This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2019 at 15:10:40 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. JOHN PARK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7560

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

PARK JOHN HYUNG

COSMO REPAIR

PARK HYUNG J.

PARK JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/15/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/15/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - Declaration Kambrie L. Keith re order to show cause

10/24/2018: Declaration - Declaration Kambrie L. Keith re order to show cause

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re Submission of Default Judgment)

10/29/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re Submission of Default Judgment)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Default Judgment)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Default Judgment)

Judgment

12/27/2018: Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/27/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Order - Order For Judgment and Court's Acceptance of Copies in Lieu of Originals

12/27/2018: Order - Order For Judgment and Court's Acceptance of Copies in Lieu of Originals

Declaration - Of Robert J. Rebhan in Support of Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585

10/15/2018: Declaration - Of Robert J. Rebhan in Support of Judgment Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585

Declaration - Of Brian P. McQurk, Esq. in Compliance with Califonia Rules of Court 1.20(b)(A), (B)

10/15/2018: Declaration - Of Brian P. McQurk, Esq. in Compliance with Califonia Rules of Court 1.20(b)(A), (B)

Declaration - Of Brian P. McGurk Re: Copies of Documents in Lieu of Originals; Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Account for Entry of Default Judgment and Brief Summary of Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1800

10/15/2018: Declaration - Of Brian P. McGurk Re: Copies of Documents in Lieu of Originals; Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Account for Entry of Default Judgment and Brief Summary of Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1800

Proof of Publication -

7/3/2018: Proof of Publication -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Docketat 2:59 PM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketOrder (For Judgment and Court's Acceptance of Copies in Lieu of Originals); Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Submission of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Submission of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; (Order to Show Cause) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause re Submission of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Kambrie L. Keith re order to show cause); Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by American Express Bank, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant