This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 20:53:59 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS JAKOV BACHAR

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAKOV BACHAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6100

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB A FEDERAL

Defendants

BACHAR YAKOV

KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA

BACHAR JAKOV AN INDIVIDUAL

BACHAR JAKOV A.

KOBY INTERNATIONAL

BACHAR JAKOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES PC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder (ORDER FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 664.6; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ENTRY OF STIPULATION FORJUDGMENT;C/F 11/15/17) - Held-Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA KOBY INTERNATIONAL ONLY; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Non-Service (AS TO JAKOV BACHAR, aka JAKOV A. BACHAR, aka YAKOV BACHAR ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Non-Service (ATTEMPTED SERVICE ON 02/10/17 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, a federal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6100    Hearing Date: January 14, 2021    Dept: C

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB v. BACHAR

CASE NO.: ****6100

HEARING: 01/14/21

#6

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB’s unopposed Motion to Enforce Settlement and Enter Judgment against Defendant JAKOV BACHAR is GRANTED. CCP ; 664.6.

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition filed as of January 12, 2021.

Plaintiff and Defendant settled this matter on or about October 30, 2017. Plaintiff has attached a copy of the written agreement between the parties. (See Penuela Decl., Ex. A.)

The unopposed motion vacating dismissal and entering judgment against Defendant JAKOV BACHAR is GRANTED pursuant to CCP ;664.6. The Dismissal entered on March 6, 2018 is hereby VACATED. Judgment is entered against Defendant BACHAR in the amount of $190,470.59, plus costs in the amount of $965.00.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant