This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/01/2018 at 18:33:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. GAGIK K AMAYAKYAN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAGIK K AMAYAKYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6406

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants

AGA TITAN INC.

AGA & TITAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

AMAYKYAN GAGIK K

AMAYAKYAN KARAPET GAGIK

AMAYAKYAN KARAPET G

AMAYAKYAN GAGIK K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketOrder (FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 664.6 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT AGA & TITAN, INC. A CALIF. CORP. DBA AGA TITAN, INC. ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCBA, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department NCBA, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Court Order - OSC Discharged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6406    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: A

Calendar 08  664.6 motion

GRANT



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGA & TITAN INC. A CORPORATION DBA ECLIPSE EYEWEAR is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant