Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2019 at 01:24:11 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS CHRIS G NELSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRIS G NELSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are FREDERICK C. SHALLER and STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5700

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

GARRETT CUSTOM HOMES

DOES 1 TO 20

GARRETT CUSTOM HOMES INC

NELSON CHRIS G.

NELSON CHRISTOPHER GARRETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/30/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/23/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI, ESQ. IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 120 (B)(2)(A),(B)

5/7/2018: DECLARATION OF LISA D. DUBOWSKI, ESQ. IN COMPLIANCE WITH CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT 120 (B)(2)(A),(B)

Minute Order

5/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/8/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

10/5/2017: ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NON SERVICE REPORT

5/2/2017: NON SERVICE REPORT

NON SERVICE REPORT

5/2/2017: NON SERVICE REPORT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/24/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

8/2/2017: DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

8/2/2017: DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMEN STATEMENT

8/2/2017: DECLARATION OF PAUL EUM RE: LATE FILING OF CASE MANAGEMEN STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/14/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF LINA M. MICHAEL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

8/22/2017: DECLARATION OF LINA M. MICHAEL RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Unknown

8/22/2017: Unknown

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO BE SUB-SERVED ON THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

8/22/2017: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT TO BE SUB-SERVED ON THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Writ - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-05-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • JUDGMENT BY COURT BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • ORDER FOR JUDGMENT AND COURT'S ACCEPTANCE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • NON SERVICE REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by American Express Bank FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. COMMON COUNTS: BOOK ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT STATED 2. QUANTUM MERUIT-REASONABLE VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARRET CUSTOM HOMES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M