This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 12:19:16 (UTC).

AMERICAN ECONOMY INSURANCE COMPANY VS. PLAN C LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 AMERICAN ECONOMY INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against PLAN C LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7107

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN ECONOMY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA BAGUETTE

PLAN C LLC

BAGUETTE LA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COZEN O'CONNOR

O'CONNOR COZEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CARRIE E. PHELAN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

5/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

4/15/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

1/24/2019: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

8/2/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Legacy Document

8/23/2017: Legacy Document

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

8/23/2017: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

9/12/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Answer

10/2/2017: Answer

Notice

10/2/2017: Notice

Legacy Document

10/2/2017: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

10/2/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

1/8/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/9/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Legacy Document

3/20/2018: Legacy Document

Notice

11/30/2018: Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Stipulated Ex-Parte Application to Continue Trial, Final Stat...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Order (Granting Stipulated Ex Parte Application); Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, Final Status Conference, and All Trial Related Deadlines, or in the Alternative, for an Order Shortening Time); Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Plan C LLC (Defendant); La Baguette (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued; Filed by Plan C LLC (Defendant); La Baguette (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • civil deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plan C LLC (Defendant); La Baguette (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Summons; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Economy Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less