This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 19:10:37 (UTC).

AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, LLC VS DANIEL EDUARDO VENTURA MORALES

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL EDUARDO VENTURA MORALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0896

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

VENTURA MORALES DANIEL EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVEY KEITH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff); Daniel Eduardo Ventura Morales (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Credit Acceptance, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Credit Acceptance, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levey, Keith