This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 08:00:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MICHAEL L. RUBIN

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL L RUBIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2184

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

RUBIN MICHAEL L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM AMBER N. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); As to: Michael L. Rubin (Defendant); Service Date: 02/13/2023; Service Cost: 59.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- American Contractors Indemnity Company (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation to American Contractors Indemnity Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Michael L. Rubin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Michael L. Rubin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Contractors Indemnity Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Michael L. Rubin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less