This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 01:31:06 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JOSEPH MATTHEW GUMINA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH MATTHEW GUMINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1733

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

GUMINA JOSEPH MATTHEW AKA JOE GUMINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM AMBER

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/14/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/14/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/14/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

1/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM AMBER