This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 05:31:51 (UTC).

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ARTHUR SARKISSIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARTHUR SARKISSIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID A. ROSEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0296

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID A. ROSEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SARGISYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ZHORA

SARKISSIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PADIAN THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

SINA REZA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/7/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

7/15/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/22/2022

8/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 08/22/2022

Answer

8/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

11/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT A...)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DEFAULT A...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • Hearing07/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (1 Day Est.) scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 09:00 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Default and Default Judgment scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Default a...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 11/14/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: ZHORA SARGISYAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ZHORA SARGISYAN, an individual (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/20/2022; Service Cost: 74.28; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR SARKISSIAN, an individual (Defendant); ZHORA SARGISYAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR SARKISSIAN, an individual (Defendant); ZHORA SARGISYAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARTHUR SARKISSIAN, an individual (Defendant); ZHORA SARGISYAN, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINA REZA