This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2023 at 01:17:12 (UTC).

AMERICAN COMMERCIAL EQUITIES THREE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS KREATION JUICERY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 AMERICAN COMMERCIAL EQUITIES THREE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KREATION JUICERY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0491

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

AMERICAN COMMERCIAL EQUITIES THREE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

KREATION JUICERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SARSHAR MARJAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGAL GLEN ROSS

Defendant Attorney

SADAT ARASH V

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

7/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/18/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/24/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

5/10/2023: Cross-Complaint

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

4/28/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

4/26/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/27/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/3/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/2/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Marjan Sarshar (Cross-Complainant),Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; Result Date: 07/19/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Marjan Sarshar (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Marjan Sarshar (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Marjan Sarshar (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Glen Ross Segal (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Samuels, Green & Steel, LLP to Green, Steel & Albrecht, LLP; Middle Name: Ross

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar (Defendant); As to: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Marjan Sarshar (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 74.90; Proof of Mailing Date: 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 74.90; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. in Department 205 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: American Commercial Equities Three, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Kreation Juicery, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Marjan Sarshar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less