This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2021 at 07:45:02 (UTC).

AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, INC. FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST VS CRAFCO, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT, INC FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRAFCO, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9972

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC. FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY AS REAL PARTY IN INTEREST

Defendant

CRAFCO INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL D.

Defendant Attorney

SHIMKIN DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/24/2020: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/4/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

10/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ACTION PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE SECTION 3853

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/18/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/7/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • Hearing08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Crafco, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crafco, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by American Claims Management, Inc. for Everest National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Action Pursuant to Labor Code Section 3853); Filed by American Claims Management, Inc. for Everest National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Claims Management, Inc. for Everest National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Claims Management, Inc. for Everest National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Claims Management, Inc. for Everest National Insurance Company as real party in interest (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC. FOR EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D