This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 02:25:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY VS SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6071

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AMERICAN CASUALTY COMPANY

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1-50

SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LUCIANO SAERIM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 57; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by American Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCIANO SAERIM