This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 01:13:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS MARIO OSWALDO MEDINA, SR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MARIO OSWALDO MEDINA, SR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8985

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEST COAST UNIVERSITY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ORTIZ ROGER ADOLFO AKA ROGER ORTIZ AKA ROGER AOFL ORTIZ MEDINA

UNETE HEALTHCARE ASSOCIATES L.L.C. DBA PRONTO WELLNESS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VALDIVIA ROLANDO AKA RAUL VALDEZ AKA RAUL VAL

MEDINA MARIO OSWALDO SR. AKA MARIO OSWALDO MEDINA ORTIZ AKA MARIO OSWALDO ORTIZ AKA MARIO M ORTIZ AKA MARIO OSWALDO MEDINO AKA MARIO ORTIZ MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARLAND MEAGAN E.

Defendant Attorney

JURKOWITZ NICHOLAS DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/28/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Status Conference and Order

4/20/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 05/07/2021

5/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 05/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Status Conference (reRemoval to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re: Removal to Federal Court) of 05/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Roger Adolfo Ortiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by American Career College, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); West Coast University, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COAST UNIVERSITY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JURKOWITZ NICHOLAS DANIEL