This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 06:04:51 (UTC).

AMER LAFI VS MICHAEL DEGUZMAN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 AMER LAFI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL DEGUZMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3959

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

LAFI AMER

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

DEGUZMAN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAZZA STEVEN L.

Defendant Attorney

MESSINA IRIS C.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FLORES NORIEL LEANO

Cross Defendant Attorney

KALPAKIAN STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/3/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/3/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Related Case

12/9/2022: Notice of Related Case

Cross-Complaint

12/1/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

11/30/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/30/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

10/25/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/20/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

10/20/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Complaint

10/20/2022: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2024
  • Hearing10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2024
  • Hearing04/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMER LAFI (Cross-Defendant); As to: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: AMER LAFI (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Status Date changed from 12/09/2022 to 12/09/2022 ; Filed By: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant); As to: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketSummons CROSS-COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant); As to: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant); As to: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMER LAFI (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL DEGUZMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.