Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 10:58:50 (UTC).

AMELIA MADRIGAL VS CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 AMELIA MADRIGAL filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7005

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADRIGAL AMELIA

Defendants

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

DELLARIPA JOHN C.R.N.A.

YOU-GANG CHEN GARY M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERBERIAN RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

10/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/21/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/28/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/29/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Hearing03/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amelia Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amelia Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amelia Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant