Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 03:10:43 (UTC).

AMELIA A. VANN TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 17, 2006

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 AMELIA A VANN TRUST DATED FEBRUARY 17, 2006 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARRY, WILLIAM and JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8275

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARRY, WILLIAM

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VANN TONN H. JR

Trustee

VANN GENEVIEVE SUNRY

Not Classified By Court

AMELIA A. VANN TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SLATER CALVIN ALLEN

BLACKMAN VAUGHN A

Trustee and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HEIMAN KALE KLEIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing

10/20/2017: Notice - Hearing

Citation - filed Citation - Genevieve Vann, trustee

11/2/2017: Citation - filed Citation - Genevieve Vann, trustee

Minute Order

11/22/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

Order - Order After Hearing on Trust Petition

3/2/2018: Order - Order After Hearing on Trust Petition

Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

3/7/2018: Cover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

Notice - Notice

3/16/2018: Notice - Notice

Notice - Hearing

3/28/2018: Notice - Hearing

Declaration - of Lee Lam in Response to Declaration of Kale K. Heiman Regarding Status of Trust Accounting

5/2/2018: Declaration - of Lee Lam in Response to Declaration of Kale K. Heiman Regarding Status of Trust Accounting

Notice - Continuance

7/18/2018: Notice - Continuance

Declaration - Declaration of Suzanne Rehmani in Support

8/1/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Suzanne Rehmani in Support

Declaration - Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman to Supplement Objections to Petition for Approval of First Account and Report of Successor Trustee Genevieve Vann and Memorandum of Points and Authoriti

8/31/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Vaughn A. Blackman to Supplement Objections to Petition for Approval of First Account and Report of Successor Trustee Genevieve Vann and Memorandum of Points and Authoriti

Supplement - Supplement

9/5/2018: Supplement - Supplement

Minute Order

9/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/19/2018: Minute Order

Supplement - Third Supplement Re Accounting Petition

12/4/2018: Supplement - Third Supplement Re Accounting Petition

Minute Order

2/11/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/29/2019: Minute Order

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue the April 29, 2019 Hearing ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Partial Settlement and for Sale of the Real Properties ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • in Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • in Probate Department 67, Barry, William, Presiding; Trust 17200 Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Objection - Trust Petition (Objection - Trust Petition ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Citation (filed Citation - Genevieve Vann, individually ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Citation (filed Citation - Genevieve Vann, trustee ); Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice - Hearing; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Citation; Filed by Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIMAN KALE KLEIN