This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 01:39:53 (UTC).

AMEERA AMMARI, ET AL. VS TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 AMEERA AMMARI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7950

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMMARI AMEERA

ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES

Defendants

ALAMITOS ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT LLC

TINALUX ASSOCIATES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORN VALERIE F.

Defendant Attorney

STROJ ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

4/18/2019: Notice

Motion for Leave

3/27/2019: Motion for Leave

Answer

3/15/2019: Answer

Motion to Consolidate

3/15/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Answer

3/15/2019: Answer

Notice

3/21/2019: Notice

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/13/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/13/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Related Case

3/12/2019: Notice of Related Case

Summons

3/7/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

3/7/2019: Unknown

Complaint

3/7/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Notice (OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION OFF CALENDER); Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Motion for Leave (to file cross-complaint); Filed by TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL); Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Answer; Filed by ALAMITOS ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Motion to Consolidate; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Answer; Filed by TINALUX ASSOCIATES, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by AMEERA AMMARI (Plaintiff); ALTIMA INSURANCE SERVICES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tinalux Associates, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALAMITOS ASSOCIATES MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORN VALERIE F.