This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 06:59:47 (UTC).

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS BOB CHAN ELECTRIC CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOB CHAN ELECTRIC CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9798

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

BOB CHAN ELECTRIC CO.

CHAN ROBERT PANG

ZHOU LIANGCHI

BCT ELECTRIC INC.

Cross Plaintiff

CHAN ROBERT PANG DBA BOB CHAN ELECTRIC CO.

Cross Defendants

SHAR PHILIP

SHAR JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KORINKO JEFFREY A. ESQ.

DEAL MICHAEL R ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHAN ROBERT PANG

RILEY OLIVER M. ESQ.

WONG PAUL W. ESQ.

WONG PAUL WATT ESQ.

LEWIS JOHN

Cross Defendant Attorney

NORTON GEOFFREY PAUL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice

2/8/2019: Notice

Case Management Statement

5/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice

5/16/2019: Notice

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

5/2/2018: NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/31/2018: NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/1/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

&NSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/6/2018: &NSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/18/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/11/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice (of Trial Setting); Filed by AMCO Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Jamie Shar (Cross-Defendant); Philip Shar (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Jamie Shar (Cross-Defendant); Philip Shar (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Bob Chan Electric Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by BCT Electric, Inc. (Defendant); Liangchi Zhou (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by AMCO Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Notice ( of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by AMCO Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Robert Pang Chan (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROBERT PANG CHAN FOR: (1) INDEMNITY; (2) APPORTIONMENT; (3) CONTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by AMCO Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by AMCO Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Feb 2718,

I,EWIS RILEY LLP 2001 E. FINANCIAL WAY, SUITE 102 GLENDORA, CALIFORNIA 91741

3 SuouE g 3l

WEROT S

W Jap 2 g

\OOO\IC\U\-PDJN

NMn—tp—-v—tn—*v—-’v—a—u—iv—a;—A

B—-O\OOO\IO\U\AQJN—'O

Lewis Riley LLI

€~""N79571 p.2 OLIVER M. RILEY, ESQ. (SBN 252459) NICKOLAS S. LEWIS, ESQ. (SBN 293477) LEWIS RILEY LLP . 2001 E. Financial Way Suite 102 "FILED Gilendora, California 91741 . Superior Court of California

ounty of Los Angeles

FEB 27 2018

Sherri Car}er E icer/Clerk By. ‘ Deputy Ricardo Perez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Telephone: (626) 387-9710 Facsimile: (626) 387-9571

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES UNLIMITED CIVIL

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY, an fowa ) Case Number: BC689798 corporation )

) PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER % TO COMPLAINT

Plaintiff, ) ) % BOB CHAN ELECTRIC CO., an Unknown ) Business Entity; ROBERT PANG CHAN ) Individually and doing business as BOB ) Complaint filed: January 11,2018 CHAN ELECTRIC CO.; and DOES 1 ) DEPT.: 19 through 50, inclusive, ) ) Defendants % U /! 1 i " H ! i N/ "

-1- A ——

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORTON GEOFFREY P