This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 00:28:37 (UTC).

AMBROSE ELIAS VS ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 AMBROSE ELIAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9010

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIAS AMBROSE

Defendants

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BUFORD SARAH

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

QUINN MONICA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 03/04/2021

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

2/23/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF AND NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING M

2/18/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF AND NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING M

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/27/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

1/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

9/24/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Answer

9/29/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

9/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ambrose Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 3:12 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Settlement;) of 03/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 3:20 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOther - (Plaintiff's Notice of Peremptory Challenge); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 08/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ambrose Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ambrose Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ambrose Elias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINN MONICA M. ESQ.