Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 22:55:08 (UTC).

AMBER VALLADARES VS VICTORY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 AMBER VALLADARES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against VICTORY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3867

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLADARES AMBER

Defendants

VICTORY AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA OCEAN HONDA OF NORTH HOLLYWOOD

HONDA NORTH AMERICA INC.

HONDA LOGISTICS NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COONS MICHAEL H.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • Hearing08/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amber Valladares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amber Valladares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amber Valladares (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victory Automotive Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Honda North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COONS MICHAEL HOWARD