This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 06:06:45 (UTC).

AMANDA RAYMOND VS HEART OF CHRISTMAS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 AMANDA RAYMOND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEART OF CHRISTMAS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5691

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMOND AMANDA

Defendants

HEART OF CHRISTMAS LLC DBA FUTURE SIGHT ENTERTAINMENT LLC

PIRNIA TARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TKACH JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request - REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING DEFAULT PROVE UP

9/17/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING DEFAULT PROVE UP

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

7/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/29/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/15/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING DEFAULT PROVE UP

9/15/2021: Request - REQUEST REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING DEFAULT PROVE UP

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/13/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest (for Trial Setting Default Prove Up); Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest (Request for Trial Setting Default Prove Up); Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Non-Service); Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amanda Raymond (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TKACH JOHN ANTHONY