This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 05:53:55 (UTC).

AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY VS DM LUXURY HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DM LUXURY HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1289

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONAGHEY AMANDA ELIZABETH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WESTFIELD LLC

WESTFIELD AMERICA LIMITED PARTNERHSIP

WESTFIELD SUBSIDIARY REIT 2 INC.

WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT INC.

YUST LARRY B.

DM LUXURY HOLDINGS LLC

WESTFIELD SUBSIDIARY REIT 1 INC.

WESTFIELD CORPORATION

YUST CLARA A.

POWER FAYE

SHROFF PRAKASH

MODERN LUXURY MEDIA LLC AKA MODERN LUXURY AKA MODERN LUXURY CUSTOM PUBLISHING

WESTFIELD CENTERS LLC

WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC

GIGGSTER INC

DM LUXURY LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLRED CYNTHIA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ORTIZ NICOLE M.

KUCK DANIELLE L

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

5/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY

Answer

10/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/29/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/8/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/10/2020: Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by DM LUXURY HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PRAKASH SHROFF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by PRAKASH SHROFF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PRAKASH SHROFF (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WESTFIELD, LLC (Defendant); FAYE POWER (Defendant); DM Luxury , LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MODERN LUXURY MEDIA, LLC (Defendant); WESTFIELD, LLC (Defendant); FAYE POWER (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMANDA ELIZABETH DONAGHEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN LUXURY MEDIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DM LUXURY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD CENTERS L.L.C. is a litigant